PA HB1715 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for special plates for recipients of Navy and Marine Corps Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, providing for special plates for recipients of Navy and Marine Corps Medal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1715 PN 3038, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04292 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2020-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-16HouseReported as amended
2019-07-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1715
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1715&pn=2308
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1715&pn=3038
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1491
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/16/2019&RollCallId=1490
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1723
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1109

Bill Comments

feedback