PA HB1712 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for special registration plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for special registration plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1712 PN 2585, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02867 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2020-02-03SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-1)
2020-02-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-22HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-25HouseReported as amended
2019-07-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1712
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1712&pn=2305
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1712&pn=2585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2019&RollCallId=1141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2019&RollCallId=1140
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1690

Bill Comments

feedback