PA HB1710 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for USA semiquincentennial registration plates.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for USA semiquincentennial registration plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1710 PN 3855, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1710 PN 3855, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1710 PN 2583, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02858 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1710 PN 3855, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1710 PN 3855, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1710 PN 2583, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A02858 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 48 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-24 | House | In the House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-02-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-22 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |