PA HB1709 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for definitions, providing for alternate tax imposed at pass-through entity level and further providing for taxability of partners, for income of a Pennsylvania S corporation and for income taxes imposed by other states.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for definitions, providing for alternate tax imposed at pass-through entity level and further providing for taxability of partners, for income of a Pennsylvania S corporation and for income taxes imposed by other states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A04425 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04425 (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04425 (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |