PA HB1704 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
Making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-12-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-10-07 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-08-03 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-03 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-16 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |