PA HB1696 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 92
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in health insurance coverage parity and nondiscrimination, further providing for definitions and for adoption of Federal acts and providing for annual attestation by insurers and for insurer analysis and disclosure information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In health insurance coverage parity and nondiscrimination, further providing for definitions and for adoption of Federal acts and providing for annual attestation by insurers and for insurer analysis and disclosure information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1696 PN 3630, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1696 PN 3630, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05248 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended A05248 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenateAct No. 92
2020-10-29SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-10-22SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-21SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-21SenateSigned in House
2020-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-09-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-07-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-13SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-30SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-30SenateReported as committed
2020-05-07SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2020-05-04SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-05-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-04-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-04-29HouseSecond consideration
2020-04-28HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-27HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-27HouseFirst consideration
2020-04-27HouseReported as amended
2019-07-08HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1696
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1696&pn=2288
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1696&pn=3630
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/27/2020&RollCallId=1830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/27/2020&RollCallId=1829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/04/2020&RollCallId=1920
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/30/2020&RollCallId=1043
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=703

Bill Comments

feedback