PA HB1692 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Iran-free procurement, further providing for expiration.
Title
In Iran-free procurement, further providing for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1692 PN 2277, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1692 PN 2277, 2017 A3564, KAUFER, GERMANE (Y: 78 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-09-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1692 PN 2277, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1692 PN 2277, 2017 A3564, KAUFER, GERMANE (Y: 78 N: 115 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-09-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-1) |
2017-10-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-03 | House | Second consideration |
2017-10-02 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-08-15 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |