PA HB169 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Passed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), entitled, as amended, "An act providing for the licensing of eligible organizations to conduct games of chance, for the licensing of persons to distribute games of chance, for the registration of manufacturers of games of chance, and for suspensions and revocations of licenses and permits; requiring records; providing for local referendum by electorate; and prescribing penalties," further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for games of chance permitted, for prize limits, for limits on sales, for distributor licenses, for regulations, for licensing of eligible organizations and for special permits; providing for club licensees; further providing for revocation of licenses, for enforcement, for local option, for advertising and for prohibited persons; providing for civil penalties; further providing for penalties; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of December 19, 1988 (P.L.1262, No.156), entitled, as amended, "An act providing for the licensing of eligible organizations to conduct games of chance, for the licensing of persons to distribute games of chance, for the registration of manufacturers of games of chance, and for suspensions and revocations of licenses and permits; requiring records; providing for local referendum by electorate; and prescribing penalties," further providing for legislative intent, for definitions, for games of chance permitted, for prize limits, for limits on sales, for distributor licenses, for regulations, for licensing of eligible organizations and for special permits; providing for club licensees; further providing for revocation of licenses, for enforcement, for local option, for advertising and for prohibited persons; providing for civil penalties; further providing for penalties; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - House - HB 169 PN 2961, CONCUR (Y: 178 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - HB 169 PN 2961, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - HB 169 PN 2819, A8093, EARLL AMENDMENT NO. A-8093 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - House - HB 169 PN 2694, FP (Y: 184 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - House - HB 169 PN 2694, 2011 A6209, SUSP RULES, BROOKS (Y: 132 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - HB 169 PN 2961, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - HB 169 PN 2819, A8093, EARLL AMENDMENT NO. A-8093 (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-12 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-05 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-15 - House - HB 169 PN 2694, FP (Y: 184 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - House - HB 169 PN 2694, 2011 A6209, SUSP RULES, BROOKS (Y: 132 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | House | Act No. 2 |
2012-02-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-01-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-01-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-01-25 | House | Signed in House |
2012-01-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (178-10) |
2012-01-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-01-23 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-01-18 | House | In the House |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-12-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-12-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-11-22 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2011-11-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-11-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-12) |
2011-11-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-11-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-11-14 | House | Second consideration |
2011-11-03 | House | Removed from table |
2011-11-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-11-02 | House | First consideration |
2011-11-02 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |