PA HB1684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits and for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, prohibiting use of interactive wireless communications devices, imposing penalties and establishing the Driver Distraction Awareness Fund; and, in operation of vehicles miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of careless driving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for learners' permits and for schedule of convictions and points; in rules of the road in general, prohibiting use of interactive wireless communications devices, imposing penalties and establishing the Driver Distraction Awareness Fund; and, in operation of vehicles miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offense of careless driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A06972 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A06950 (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-30HouseReported as amended
2017-07-27HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1684
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1684&pn=2261
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1684&pn=3460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/30/2018&RollCallId=1464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/30/2018&RollCallId=1465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/30/2018&RollCallId=1466

Bill Comments

feedback