PA HB1677 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in general powers and duties, providing for coordinated service delivery pilot program; in public assistance, further providing for meeting special needs, work supports and incentives, for medical assistance payments for institutional care and providing for nonemergency medical transportation services; creating opportunities for hospitals and managed care organizations to improve health care outcomes and to further reduce unnecessary and inappropriate services in the Commonwealth's medical assistance program; in the aged, establishing the LIFE Program; in children and youth, further providing for provider submissions; in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions, for implementation, for administration, for the Quality Care Assessment Account and for expiration; in departmental powers and duties as to supervision, further providing for definitions; in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for definitions; and imposing a duty on the Department of Human Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general powers and duties, providing for coordinated service delivery pilot program; in public assistance, further providing for meeting special needs, work supports and incentives, for medical assistance payments for institutional care and providing for nonemergency medical transportation services; creating opportunities for hospitals and managed care organizations to improve health care outcomes and to further reduce unnecessary and inappropriate services in the Commonwealth's medical assistance program; in the aged, establishing the LIFE Program; in children and youth, further providing for provider submissions; in Statewide quality care assessment, further providing for definitions, for implementation, for administration, for the Quality Care Assessment Account and for expiration; in departmental powers and duties as to supervision, further providing for definitions; in departmental powers and duties as to licensing, further providing for definitions; and imposing a duty on the Department of Human Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1677 PN 3809, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1677 PN 3809, CONCUR (Y: 186 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1677 PN 2736, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A04759 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseAct No. 40
2018-06-22HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (186-7)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-22HouseIn the House
2018-06-22SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-22SenateRe-reported as amended
2018-06-19SenateRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-12SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-12SenateReported as amended
2018-01-02SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-12-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as amended
2017-07-21HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1677
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1677&pn=2246
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1677&pn=2736
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1677&pn=3675
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1677&pn=3809
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1058
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1057
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=901
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/12/2018&RollCallId=926
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=964
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=605
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1043
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1854

Bill Comments

feedback