PA HB1671 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 54-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board; and, in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the State Employees' Retirement Board.
Title
In administration and miscellaneous provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the Public School Employees' Retirement Board; and, in administration, funds, accounts and general provisions, further providing for administrative duties of the State Employees' Retirement Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1671 PN 3055, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04033 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1671 PN 3055, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04033 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-09-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-09-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-7) |
2022-09-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-19 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-14 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-30 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-27 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |