PA HB1671 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 14, 1963 (P.L.839, No.407), entitled, as amended, "An act creating a county records committee; imposing powers and duties upon it; authorizing the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission to assist and cooperate with it; defining county records; and authorizing the disposition of certain county records by county officers in counties of the second to eighth class," increasing the membership of the committee.
Title
An Act amending the act of August 14, 1963 (P.L.839, No.407), entitled, as amended, "An act creating a county records committee; imposing powers and duties upon it; authorizing the Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission to assist and cooperate with it; defining county records; and authorizing the disposition of certain county records by county officers in counties of the second to eighth class," increasing the membership of the committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Richard Grucela [D] | Rep. David Kessler [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-09-28 - Senate - HB 1671 PN 2112, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1671 PN 2112, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1671 PN 2112, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Act No. 67 | |
2010-10-07 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in House | |
2010-09-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-27 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-26 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-22 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-16 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |