PA HB1665 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 68 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 68 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1970 (P.L.484, No.164), entitled "An act relating to indemnification agreements between architects, engineers or surveyors and owners, contractors, subcontractors or suppliers," further providing for title of act and providing for indemnification agreements relating to snow removal or ice control services.
Title
Amending the act of July 9, 1970 (P.L.484, No.164), entitled "An act relating to indemnification agreements between architects, engineers or surveyors and owners, contractors, subcontractors or suppliers," further providing for title of act and providing for indemnification agreements relating to snow removal or ice control services.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Quinn [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Steven Malagari [D] | Rep. Wendi Thomas [R] |
Rep. Todd Polinchock [R] | Rep. Todd Stephens [R] | Rep. Meghan Schroeder [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1665 PN 2733, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1665 PN 2733, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended A03614 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03614 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1665 PN 2406, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02928 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1665 PN 2733, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended A03614 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03614 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1665 PN 2406, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02928 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 68 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-30 | House | In the House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-01-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-01-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2022-01-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |