PA HB1665 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 7381, on that portion of North Main Street over the East Branch Perkiomen Creek, Sellersville Borough, Bucks County, as the Sellersville Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified by Bridge Key 7381, on that portion of North Main Street over the East Branch Perkiomen Creek, Sellersville Borough, Bucks County, as the Sellersville Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1665 PN 2223, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1665 PN 2223, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-11-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-11-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2019-11-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |