PA HB1660 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in duties and powers of boards of school directors, further providing for temporary emergency provisions.
Title
In duties and powers of boards of school directors, further providing for temporary emergency provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A02864 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1660 PN 1882, FP (Y: 118 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01916 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1660 PN 1882, FP (Y: 118 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01916 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (118-82) |
2021-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-21 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |