PA HB1655 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Patient-Centered Medical Home Advisory Council; providing powers and duties of the council, the Department of Human Services; and providing for development of a plan to implement a Statewide medical home model.
Title
Establishing the Patient-Centered Medical Home Advisory Council; providing powers and duties of the council, the Department of Human Services; and providing for development of a plan to implement a Statewide medical home model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 198 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2014-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-08-26 | House | Referred to HEALTH |