PA HB1650 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 67 (Public Welfare) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in human services generally, reorganizing provisions relating to adoption opportunities and to family finding and kinship care; and making editorial changes.
Title
In human services generally, reorganizing provisions relating to adoption opportunities and to family finding and kinship care; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1650 PN 1837, FP (Y: 183 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1650 PN 1837, FP (Y: 183 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2021-09-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (183-0) |
2021-09-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |