PA HB165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - Act No. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in decorations, medals, badges and awards, further providing for authorized decorations, medals, badges and awards and for specifications.
Title
In decorations, medals, badges and awards, further providing for authorized decorations, medals, badges and awards and for specifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 165 PN 129, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 165 PN 129, FP (Y: 185 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor: HB 165 PN 129, FP (Y: 185 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | Act No. 56 |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-03-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-12) |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |