PA HB1646 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices and providing for automated speed enforcement systems; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for careless driving.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices and providing for automated speed enforcement systems; and, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for careless driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1646 PN 2466, FP (Y: 161 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03424 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2018-05-23SenateFirst consideration
2018-05-23SenateReported as amended
2017-11-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-16SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (161-30)
2017-10-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-02HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-02HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-25HouseReported as amended
2017-07-07HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1646
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1646&pn=2205
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1646&pn=2466
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1646&pn=3568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=897
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=898
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=949
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=747
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=870

Bill Comments

feedback