PA HB1644 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in civil actions and proceedings, extensively revising statutory arbitration and providing for collaborative law process; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In civil actions and proceedings, extensively revising statutory arbitration and providing for collaborative law process; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1644 PN 3783, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1644 PN 3783, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1644 PN 2199, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseAct No. 55
2018-06-28HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (193-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-21HouseIn the House
2018-06-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-2)
2018-06-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as committed
2017-12-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as committed
2017-06-30HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1644
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1644&pn=2199
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1644&pn=3783
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=887
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1125
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=892
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=583
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1853
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1431

Bill Comments

feedback