PA HB1641 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-14 - Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-14 - Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8517, carrying Pennsylvania Route 403 over the Stonycreek River in Ferndale Borough, Cambria County, as the Private First Class Lee David Meadows Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8517, carrying Pennsylvania Route 403 over the Stonycreek River in Ferndale Borough, Cambria County, as the Private First Class Lee David Meadows Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-14 | House | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-26 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-11 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-06 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |