PA HB1639 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 113 from its intersection with Schoolhouse Road, in Franconia Township, Montgomery County, and State Route 4027, also known as County Line Road, in Souderton Borough, Montgomery County, as the Honorable Robert W. Godshall Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 113 from its intersection with Schoolhouse Road, in Franconia Township, Montgomery County, and State Route 4027, also known as County Line Road, in Souderton Borough, Montgomery County, as the Honorable Robert W. Godshall Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |