PA HB1634 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in support matters generally, further providing for costs and fees and for State disbursement unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In support matters generally, further providing for costs and fees and for State disbursement unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1634 PN 2258, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1634 PN 2186, 2019 A2393, BOBACK (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A02060 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-26SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2019-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration, rescinded
2019-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-18HouseReported as amended
2019-06-14HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1634
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1634&pn=2140
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1634&pn=2186
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1634&pn=2258
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=801
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=802
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2019&RollCallId=867
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=945
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=598

Bill Comments

feedback