PA HB1633 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-04 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for comprehensive health care for uninsured children; and making a repeal.
Title
Providing for comprehensive health care for uninsured children; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2547, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04144 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04144 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1633 PN 2547, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04144 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-18 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A04144 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-04 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2015-12-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-12-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2015-12-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-11-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-11-24 | House | Second consideration |
2015-11-23 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-18 | House | First consideration |
2015-11-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-10-15 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |