PA HB1632 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and for sentences for certain drug offenses committed with firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sentencing, further providing for sentences for offenses committed with firearms and for sentences for certain drug offenses committed with firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1632 PN 2366, FP (Y: 165 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-30SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2015-10-28SenateIn the Senate
2015-10-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (165-31)
2015-10-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-10-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-10-26HouseSecond consideration
2015-10-20HouseRemoved from table
2015-10-20HouseLaid on the table
2015-10-20HouseFirst consideration
2015-10-20HouseReported as committed
2015-10-15HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1632
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1632&pn=2366
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/20/2015&rNbr=1011
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=834
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/28/2015&rNbr=1085
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/20/2015&RollCallId=1011
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/28/2015&RollCallId=1085

Bill Comments 750

feedback