PA HB162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-11 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-11 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting discrimination in certain insurance policies based on certain drugs.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination in certain insurance policies based on certain drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2018 |
2021-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |