PA HB1619 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-26 - Act No. 112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing for the form of the compact; and imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth and the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.
Title
Authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing for the form of the compact; and imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth and the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1619 PN 2348, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1619 PN 2348, FP (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1619 PN 2348, FP (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Act No. 112 |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (182-0) |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-08 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred to HEALTH |