PA HB1618 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health: To Table (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2018-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2018-04-10HouseReported as committed
2017-06-23HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback