PA HB1614 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and for sale or transfer of firearms; and, in commencement of proceedings, further providing for Statewide municipal police jurisdiction, for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction and for agents of the Office of Attorney General and providing for interpretation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and for sale or transfer of firearms; and, in commencement of proceedings, further providing for Statewide municipal police jurisdiction, for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction and for agents of the Office of Attorney General and providing for interpretation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1614 PN 2214, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1614 PN 2214, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1614 PN 2184, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1614 PN 2092, 2019 A2110, WHITE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02HouseAct No. 58
2019-07-02HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-28HouseSigned in House
2019-06-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-3)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-27HouseIn the House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as amended
2019-06-21SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-06-11HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1614
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1614&pn=2092
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1614&pn=2184
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1614&pn=2214
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=707
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=473
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=783
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=500
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=850
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=394
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/26/2019&RollCallId=470
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=245
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=999
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=633

Bill Comments 750

feedback