PA HB1614 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 25 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on June 25 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for additional investment authority for subsidiaries and for real estate which may be acquired, held and conveyed.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for additional investment authority for subsidiaries and for real estate which may be acquired, held and conveyed.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Sen. Thomas Killion [R] | Rep. Nicholas Micozzie [R] |
Rep. Steven Nickol [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-07-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-07-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-29 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-29 | First consideration | |
2007-06-29 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-25 | Referred to INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1614 |