PA HB1610 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in contracts, further providing for general regulations concerning contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for general regulations concerning contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Warren Kampf [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-04 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |