PA HB161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-24 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.
Title
In offenses against the family, further providing for the offense of dealing in infant children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 161 PN 3195, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 161 PN 135, 2019 A4501, BRIGGS (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Floor: HB 161 PN 3195, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House Floor: HB 161 PN 135, 2019 A4501, BRIGGS (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-01-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-01-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |