PA HB1608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge carrying U.S. Route 22 over the Juniata River, Norfolk Southern Corporation rail tracks and State Route 1010 (Penn Street) in Smithfield and Henderson Townships, Huntingdon County, as the Trooper Landon E. Weaver Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge carrying U.S. Route 22 over the Juniata River, Norfolk Southern Corporation rail tracks and State Route 1010 (Penn Street) in Smithfield and Henderson Townships, Huntingdon County, as the Trooper Landon E. Weaver Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1608 PN 2126, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1608 PN 2126, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateAct No. 1
2018-02-01SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-01-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-01-24SenateSigned in Senate
2018-01-24SenateSigned in House
2018-01-23SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2018-01-22SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-25SenateReported as committed
2017-09-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-09-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as committed
2017-06-22HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1608
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1608&pn=2126
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=761
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=909
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=388

Bill Comments

feedback