PA HB1603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for trespass on private property while hunting.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for trespass on private property while hunting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |