PA HB1602 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1008 over the Codorus Creek in East Manchester Township and Hellam Township, York County, as the SPC Martin Wilson Kondor Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 119 over the Pine Run Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the PFC Frank Enzer Weiss United States Marine Corps Bridge; designating the bridge on State Route 125 before Ridge Road in Pitman, Schuylkill County, as the Abner Yoder Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 562 in Berks County as the General Carl A. Spaatz Memorial Highway; designating portions of Interstate Route 176 in New Morgan Borough, Caernarvon Township, Robeson Township and Cumru Township, Berks County, as the Vietnam War Veterans Memorial Highway, the Persian Gulf War Veterans Memorial Highway and the Iraq and Afghanistan War Veterans Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 611 beginning at mile marker 391 and ending at the Pennsylvania Route 940 intersection, Monroe County, as the Roy J. Gross, Sr., Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1008 over the Codorus Creek in East Manchester Township and Hellam Township, York County, as the SPC Martin Wilson Kondor Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 119 over the Pine Run Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the PFC Frank Enzer Weiss United States Marine Corps Bridge; designating the bridge on State Route 125 before Ridge Road in Pitman, Schuylkill County, as the Abner Yoder Memorial Bridge; designating a portion of State Route 562 in Berks County as the General Carl A. Spaatz Memorial Highway; designating portions of Interstate Route 176 in New Morgan Borough, Caernarvon Township, Robeson Township and Cumru Township, Berks County, as the Vietnam War Veterans Memorial Highway, the Persian Gulf War Veterans Memorial Highway and the Iraq and Afghanistan War Veterans Memorial Highway; and designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 611 beginning at mile marker 391 and ending at the Pennsylvania Route 940 intersection, Monroe County, as the Roy J. Gross, Sr., Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1602 PN 2821, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1602 PN 2821, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1602 PN 2120, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseAct No. 4
2018-02-15HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-02-06HousePresented to the Governor
2018-02-06HouseSigned in Senate
2018-02-05HouseSigned in House
2018-02-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
2018-02-05HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-12-13HouseReferred to RULES
2017-12-13HouseIn the House
2017-12-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2017-12-13SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-12-12SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-25SenateReported as amended
2017-09-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-09-25SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-09-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as committed
2017-06-22HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1602
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1602&pn=2120
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1602&pn=2648
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1602&pn=2821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=760
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=687
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/25/2017&RollCallId=908
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=523
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=02/05/2018&RollCallId=1246
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=992

Bill Comments

feedback