PA HB16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, providing for payment of taxes; and further providing for notices of taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for payment of taxes; and further providing for notices of taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 16 PN 1056, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 16 PN 1056, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00419 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-30SenateAct No. 38
2017-10-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-10-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-10-23SenateSigned in Senate
2017-10-18SenateSigned in House
2017-10-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-10-16SenateRemoved from table
2017-06-30SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-05-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-09SenateSecond consideration
2017-04-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-04-18SenateReported as committed
2017-04-06SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-04-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-04HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-03HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-22HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-22HouseReported as amended
2017-02-06HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=16
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0016&pn=0349
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0016&pn=1056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=145
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2017&RollCallId=211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=101
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/12/2017&RollCallId=236
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=293

Bill Comments

feedback