PA HB1598 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 65 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-11 - Act No. 65 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 4, 1978 (P.L.851, No.166), known as the Flood Plain Management Act, replacing references to the Department of Community Affairs with the Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency; in miscellaneous and appropriations, repealing provisions related to appropriations; making a related repeal; and making editorial changes.
Title
Replacing references to the Department of Community Affairs with the Pennsylvania Emergency Management Agency; in miscellaneous and appropriations, repealing provisions related to appropriations; making a related repeal; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Boback [R] | Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Susan Helm [R] |
Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R] | Rep. Christopher Sainato [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1598 PN 2140, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1598 PN 2140, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopted A02261 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1598 PN 1763, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1598 PN 2140, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1598 PN 2140, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopted A02261 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1598 PN 1763, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Act No. 65 of 2022 |
2022-07-11 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-07 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-07-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Signed in House |
2022-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (189-11) |
2022-07-01 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-30 | House | In the House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |