PA HB1597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-29 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in determination of compensation, appeals, reviews and procedure, further providing for determination of compensation appeals and for decision of referee and further appeals and reviews.
Title
In determination of compensation, appeals, reviews and procedure, further providing for determination of compensation appeals and for decision of referee and further appeals and reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2106, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1597 PN 2106, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-02 | House | Second consideration |
2017-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-25 | House | First consideration |
2017-09-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |