PA HB1592 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in general provisions, providing for certain transmittals and submissions to governmental bodies.
Title
In general provisions, providing for certain transmittals and submissions to governmental bodies.
Sponsors
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] |
Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |