PA HB1591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Act No. 74 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Act No. 74 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, in names and corporate powers, classification of counties, further providing for ascertainment, certification and effect of change of class; and making related repeals.
Title
In names and corporate powers, classification of counties, further providing for ascertainment, certification and effect of change of class; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. Christina Sappey [D] | Rep. Ryan Warner [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1591 PN 2139, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1591 PN 2139, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Amendment A02032 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1591 PN 1754, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1591 PN 2139, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1591 PN 2139, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Amendment A02032 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1591 PN 1754, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | House | Act No. 74 of 2021 |
2021-10-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-09-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-09-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Signed in House |
2021-09-29 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-09-28 | House | In the House |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |