PA HB159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for summary offenses and for adjudication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In juvenile matters, further providing for definitions, for summary offenses and for adjudication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 159 PN 123, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as amended
2017-02-15SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-02-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2017-02-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-25HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=159
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0159&pn=0123
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0159&pn=3607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/25/2017&RollCallId=12
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=28
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=56
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=888

Bill Comments

feedback