PA HB1588 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 8 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 8 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 7 (Banks and Banking) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in mortgage loan industry licensing and consumer protection, further providing for definitions, for license requirements, for exceptions to license requirements, for general requirements, for powers conferred on certain licensees engaged in the mortgage loan business, for mortgage loan business prohibitions, for application for license, for prelicensing and continuing education, for license fees, for licensee requirements, for suspension, revocation or refusal and for mortgage servicers.
Title
In mortgage loan industry licensing and consumer protection, further providing for definitions, for license requirements, for exceptions to license requirements, for general requirements, for powers conferred on certain licensees engaged in the mortgage loan business, for mortgage loan business prohibitions, for application for license, for prelicensing and continuing education, for license fees, for licensee requirements, for suspension, revocation or refusal and for mortgage servicers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1588 PN 2323, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1588 PN 2323, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02226 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1588 PN 1821, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01574 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01621 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1588 PN 2323, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1588 PN 2323, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02226 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1588 PN 1821, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01574 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01621 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Act No. 8 of 2022 |
2022-02-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-01-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-01-24 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Signed in House |
2022-01-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-01-19 | House | In the House |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2021-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |