PA HB1586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 23789, carrying Pennsylvania Route 93 over Nescopeck Creek, Sugarloaf Township, Luzerne County, as the Corporal Harry A. Wagner Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 23789, carrying Pennsylvania Route 93 over Nescopeck Creek, Sugarloaf Township, Luzerne County, as the Corporal Harry A. Wagner Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |