PA HB1584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, repealing provisions relating to waterways patrolmen and employees.
Title
In Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission, repealing provisions relating to waterways patrolmen and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1584 PN 2032, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1584 PN 2032, FP (Y: 180 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1584 PN 2032, FP (Y: 180 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Act No. 90 |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2020-02-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (180-13) |
2020-02-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-03 | House | Second consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |