PA HB1582 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in auditors and accountants, further providing for appointment of accountant and providing for appointment of independent auditor and abolishment of office of elected auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In auditors and accountants, further providing for appointment of accountant and providing for appointment of independent auditor and abolishment of office of elected auditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1582 PN 2577, FP (Y: 197 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02912 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02917 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-21SenateSecond consideration
2020-09-08SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-08SenateReported as committed
2020-07-13SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2020-07-08SenateIn the Senate
2020-07-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-4)
2020-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-07-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-07-07HouseSecond consideration
2020-06-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-17HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-06-05HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1582
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1582&pn=2012
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1582&pn=2577
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1095
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1097
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1501
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/08/2020&RollCallId=2348
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=09/08/2020&RollCallId=1086

Bill Comments

feedback