PA HB1564 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Third consideration and final passage (198-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure), 53 (Municipalities Generally) and 57 (Notaries Public) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration; in general provisions, emergency seat of government, providing for other emergencies and further providing for applicability of subchapter; in consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for subjects of local taxation and for assessment of mobile homes and house trailers; and, in Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Uniform Unsworn Foreign Declarations Act, further providing for heading of chapter, for short title of chapter, for definitions, for applicability and for form of unsworn declaration; in general provisions, emergency seat of government, providing for other emergencies and further providing for applicability of subchapter; in consolidated county assessment, further providing for definitions, for subjects of local taxation and for assessment of mobile homes and house trailers; and, in Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, further providing for authority to perform notarial act, providing for notarial act performed by remotely located individual and further providing for notification regarding performance of notarial act on electronic record and selection of technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1564 PN 3497, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1564 PN 1987, 2019 A4847, M. K. KELLER (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1564 PN 1987, 2019 A4871, HARRIS (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1564 PN 1987, 2019 A1960, CIRESI (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1564 PN 1987, 2019 A2664, EMRICK (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2020-03-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-03-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-03-24HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-12HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-12HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-12HouseReported as committed
2019-06-04HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1564
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1564&pn=1987
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1564&pn=3497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=724
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1130
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1131
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1141
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/25/2020&RollCallId=1747

Bill Comments

feedback