PA HB1563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in restructuring of electric utility industry, further providing for duties of electric distribution companies.
Title
In restructuring of electric utility industry, further providing for duties of electric distribution companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1563 PN 2042, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1563 PN 2042, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-1) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-26 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-26 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |