PA HB1561 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 32 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 32 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1976 (P.L.817, No.143), known as the Mental Health Procedures Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions and for confidentiality of records.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions and for confidentiality of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1561 PN 2317, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1561 PN 2317, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02594 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1561 PN 2317, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02594 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 32 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-3) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-11-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-11-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-08 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |