PA HB1555 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated States, in sentencing, further providing for order of probation and for modification or revocation of order of probation; in other criminal provisions, further providing for definitions and for supervisory relationship to offenders; and, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated States, in sentencing, further providing for order of probation and for modification or revocation of order of probation; in other criminal provisions, further providing for definitions and for supervisory relationship to offenders; and, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04167 (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04167 (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2020-03-25HouseRemoved from table
2020-03-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-09HouseReported as amended
2019-05-30HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1555
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1555&pn=1937
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1555&pn=3006
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1464

Bill Comments

feedback