PA HB1555 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on June 14 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-10-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a public solicitation for proposals, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the City and County of Philadelphia, known as the Philadelphia State Office Building.
Title
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a public solicitation for proposals, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the City and County of Philadelphia, known as the Philadelphia State Office Building.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-15 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-21 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2007-06-21 | First consideration | |
2007-06-21 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-14 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1555 |